Financial history SUNDERLAND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.81k £42.08k £28.37k £42.13k £44.92k
Total expenditure £33.70k £19.98k £29.06k £33.62k £45.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A