Trustees SUNDERLAND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 520713

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH LOWES | Chair | 07 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Ian David Simpson | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James William Elliot | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Horton | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Cooper | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carlton Peter Gronow | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Atkinson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Arthur Whatt | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY ANNE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.