BELMONT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Belmont Community Centre has a sports hall, three meeting rooms, newly refurbished kitchen and toilet block, new interior doors and extensive re-decoration. Belmont School facilities include sports pitches, Astroturf, sports hall (including state of the art badminton facilities), gymnasium & meeting rooms. Both sites have extensive car parking and are on major bus routes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 30 December 1965: Standard registration
- 24 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1177041 BELMONT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- BELMONT COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.32k | £64.04k | £96.75k | £130.50k | £103.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.80k | £67.04k | £88.05k | £121.32k | £105.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.50k | £0 | £6.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 10 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 10 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 19 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 04 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
04 August 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1965 AMENDED 12 MAY 1972, 5 MAY 1975, 5 DECEMBER 1979 AND 26 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BELMONT PARISH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
BELMONT PARISH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window