TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA INSTITUTE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The key objects are: 1. Promoting research into the causes, diagnosis and management of trigeminal neuralgia; 2. Providing a diagnostic service for trigeminal neuralgia and signposting patients to centres of excellence where they can receive treatment; 3. Advancing education in trigeminal neuralgia amongst healthcare professionals to enable them to provide effective care to patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 August 2023: CIO registration
- TNI UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ann Gail Hayes Ph.D. | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR SIMON TATE | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Joanna Zakrzewska MD FFPMRCA | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA BY: A) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS AND MANAGEMENT OF TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA; B) PROVIDING A DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE FOR TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA AND SIGNPOSTING PATIENTS TO CENTRES OF EXCELLENCE WHERE THEY CAN RECEIVE TREATMENT; AND C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA AMONGST HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS TO ENABLE THEM TO PROVIDE EFFECTIVE CARE TO THEIR PATIENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dental Medicine
UCLH
c/o Prof J. Zakrzewska
250 Euston Road
- Phone:
- 02034561195
- Email:
- j.zakrzewska@ucl.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window