TRANSITION WILMSLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transition Wilmslow aims to build a sustainable town by working with people across our whole community to look after our natural environment, address climate change and share skills and knowledge. We undertake actions relating to our mission via a range of regular groups including food, trees, energy, transport and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 09 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Backhouse | Chair | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Fazackerley | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Hughes | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Parker | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Collier | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Martine Gradwell | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA JANE MCCLORY | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lata Anderson | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Ken Wallace | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF TRANSITION WILMSLOW ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WILMSLOW, HANDFORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH PROMOTION, AWARENESS RAISING AND SKILL SHARING TO BUILD COMMUNITY RESILIENCE TO COMBAT CLIMATE CHANGE AND RESOURCE SCARCITY; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quaker Meeting House
1A Bourne Street
WILMSLOW
Cheshire
SK9 5HD
- Phone:
- 07929188014
- Email:
- transitionwilmslow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window