TORBAY PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote equality and diversity for the benefit of the public in Torbay and the surrounding areas, in particular, but not exclusively, by: The elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation or gender identity; Advancing education and raising awareness of equality and diversity and the issues faced by LGBTQ people whether by teaching, interaction, performance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Smith | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Almond | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Albion Perrott | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William James Emery | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Ashley Robert Stone | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia SANCHEZ | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Keith Alexander Cook | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE ISSUES FACED BY LGBQT+ PEOPLE WHETHER BY TEACHING, INTERACTION, PERFORMANCE OR PRODUCING AND/OR DISPLAYING ARTISTIC AND OTHER MATERIALS AND CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) DELIVERING AN ANNUAL LGBQT+ PARADE AND FESTIVAL AS WELL AS SMALLER EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES HELD FOR THE LGBQT+ COMMUNITY AND ITS ALLIES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR, IN ORDER TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 GRENVILLE AVENUE
TORQUAY
TQ2 6DP
- Phone:
- 07366417402
- Email:
- torbaypride@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window