Trustees TORBAY PRIDE
Charity number: 1201697

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Smith | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Almond | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Albion Perrott | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William James Emery | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Ashley Robert Stone | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia SANCHEZ | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Keith Alexander Cook | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.