BREAKING THE CYCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preventative Programmes. Working with young people in crisis, helping to identify trigger points, communication styles and emotional management tools and techniques. Inspirational and Educational Programmes. Gender specific programmes for young people aged 11 to 16, exploring themes such as social and peer pressure, saying no to unwanted advances, Time to Talk. One-to-one mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Chilvers | Chair | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillippa Damalie | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Lee | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Sutton | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES TO SCHOOLS AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS FOCUSED ON OVERCOMING FACTORS THAT INHIBIT YOUNG PEOPLE’S PROGRESS AND ACHIEVEMENT (SUCH AS POVERTY, DISCRIMINATION AND PREJUDICE) BY DEVELOPING PROGRAMMES FOCUSED ON NON-CURRICULAR TOPICS AND SUBJECTS SUCH AS PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES, AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND B. ADVANCING EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 SHEPPARD WAY
ROTHLEY
LEICESTER
LE7 7WG
- Phone:
- 07854038899
- Website:
-
breaking-the-cycle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window