MEISTAD ABUNDANT FAITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith through weekly Sunday sermons, Sunday school for adults and children, bible studies and outreach. To provide education about the Christian faith to the public in line with our statement of faith and beliefs in Jesus Christ. To prevent hardship and poverty in the community by providing food, clothes and financial awareness information for families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivier Le Grand Kamga | Chair | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Razzi Paulin Bogui Kessie | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elie Levy Nestor Zouogbo | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vidal Biagne | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Zagbayou | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH WEEKLY SUNDAY SERMONS, SUNDAY SCHOOL FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN, BIBLE STUDY AND OUTREACH. 2. PROVIDE EDUCATION ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO THE PUBLIC IN LINE WITH OUR STATEMENT OF FAITH AND BELIEFS IN JESUS CHRIST. 3. TO PREVENT HARDSHIP AND POVERTY IN THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHES AND FINANCIAL AWARENESS INFORMATION FOR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER HALL
ST PETERS CHURCH
DISRAELI GARDENS
BEESTON
LEEDS
WEST YOR
- Phone:
- 07892720216
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window