D J EVANS YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 520751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a safe place where young people can develop socially,personally and educationally and be helped to develop skills to help in adult life. Sessions include Healthy Eating,Gym and Weights, Arts and Crafts, Computer Activities and sessions for young people who have left school but are not employed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £76,526
Total expenditure: £76,089

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • Bowburn Youth Project (Working name)
  • DJ EVANS YOUTH CLUB BOWBURN YOUTH PROJECT (Working name)
  • D J EVANS CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET BLAKEY Chair 30 September 2011
BOWBURN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BOWBURN BANNER GROUP
Received: On time
STRAY AID LTD
Received: On time
Benjamin Griffiths Trustee 13 October 2023
None on record
ANDREW SHUTT Trustee 12 October 2023
BOWBURN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Shaun Carter Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Rebecca Diane Avery Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Joan Beck Trustee
THE BOWBURN BANNER GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £68.58k £40.13k £77.10k £79.42k £76.53k
Total expenditure £67.50k £51.26k £50.24k £67.43k £76.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.68k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DJ Evans Youth Club
Burn Street
Bowburn
DURHAM
DH6 5AN
Phone:
01913770615
Website:

No information available