CHESTER-LE-STREET YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities in Chester le Street Youth Centre are currently available for young people age 13-19 years old with the aim of providing a range of opportunities to enhance social and personal development. Youth work in Chester le Street aims to support young people as they make the transition from adolescence to adulthood, so that they can become happy, confident and healthy adults .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 05 January 1970: Standard registration
- CHESTER-LE-STREET YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN HEDLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Agar | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAKE ROLLINGS | Trustee | 31 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
KARON FENTON | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATTERSON | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.99k | £17.52k | £6.89k | £14.16k | £4.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.80k | £38.96k | £4.84k | £10.29k | £10.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE OR SEX OF POLITICALM RELIGIOUS OR OTHER BELIEF OR THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATUITY AS DIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
CHESTER-LE-STREET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHESTER LE ST YOUTH CNTR MGMT CTTEE
CHESTER LE STREET YOUTH CENTRE
ONE POINT
CONE TERRACE
CHESTER LE STREET
DH3 3QH
- Phone:
- 01913884770
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window