NINETYFOLD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trusts beneficiaries will be Christian Organisations whose main purpose or aim is to further the Christian faith or individuals within a church or Christian community who have an identified need or purpose which will encourage the growth of their faith or ministry. The Trust will not consider applications to support animals, buildings, and overseas projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aileen Houston | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Lewis Mervyn Houston | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Houston | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Houston | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £397.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS AND TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1729
Northampton
Nn2 1LZ
- Phone:
- 01327701669
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window