EVERY YOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Every Youth exists to help the most disadvataged young people succeed in life. Homelessness is our chosen indicator of disadvantage and is a symptom of complex issues - often throughout childhood - that can only be addressed through holistic and patient support. We believe that with such support young people can overcome trauma and succeed on their terms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,018,412
Donations and legacies | £1.02m | |
Charitable activities | £2.82k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,085,443
Raising funds | £157.79k | |
Charitable activities | £927.66k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £157.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £927.66k |
People

8 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 2023: Standard registration
- "EVERY YOUTH" WILL SOMETIMES BE STYLISED AS "EVERYYOUTH" (Working name)
- Previously known as the project End Youth Homelessness (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Polson | Chair | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Ramos | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kay | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Pugh | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Edwards | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Garrod | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Paul Wood | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES BEECHER | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £998.85k | £1.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.95k | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £998.85k | £1.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £2.82k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.95k | £927.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £157.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £13.15k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.24k | £17.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £993.36k | £1.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £22.70k | £115.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, RELIEF OF NEED AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN YOUNG PERSONS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, INCLUDING BY: - THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH; - FUNDING AND SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SERVICES FOR HOMELESS YOUNG PEOPLE; - THE FACILITATION OF COLLABORATION BETWEEN, AND INFORMATION SHARING AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICES AMONGST, THE MEMBERS AND RELEVANT THIRD PARTIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND GLOBALLY TO IMPROVE OUTCOMES FOR HOMELESS YOUNG PEOPLE; AND - PROMOTING THE ISSUE OF YOUTH HOMELESSNESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND GLOBALLY TO MOBILISE SUPPORT FOR THE CHARITY AND THE MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hoxton Mix Ltd
86-90 Paul Street
LONDON
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 07725660370
- Email:
- info@everyyouth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window