YUVANIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yuvanis Foundation provides activities and services for BAME communities to improve their lives. Our strategy: 1) Engage in physical activities for better physical health 2) Encourage better care of mental health 3) Empower through personal development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £49,425 from 5 government contract(s) and £49,425 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 December 2022: CIO registration
- YUVANIS YOUTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Zahir Ahmad | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shakeel Mohibur Rahman | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sadique Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mashuda Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE OF ASIAN, AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ORIGIN WHO RESIDE IN OLDHAM AND GREATER MANCHESTER, AFFECTED BY RACIAL, CULTURAL, SOCIAL, AND HEALTH INEQUALITIES THROUGH: I. PROVIDING AND FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH SPORTS, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE; II. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; III. PROVIDING SELF-DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES TO BUILD SELF-ESTEEM AND CONFIDENCE THROUGH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS WORKSHOPS AND TRAININGS; IV. PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT FROM FULLY TRAINED STAFF/VOLUNTEERS AND SIGNPOST TO SPECIALISED ORGANISATIONS WHERE APPROPRIATE. B) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHADDERTON L&D CENTRE
MIDDLETON ROAD
CHADDERTON
OLDHAM
OL9 6JN
- Phone:
- 07931167537
- Email:
- admin@yuvanis.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window