THE BRAMSHAW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a Village Hall for the benefit of the residents of the Parish of Bramshaw. Hall is used for Dancing (Tango, Mojive, Line, Old Time etc) Private Parties, Weddings, W.I. Theatre Groups, Orchestras, Toddler Groups, Horticulture Society, Film Club and many more organisations. It has limited capacity for holding sporting activities for example Short Mat Bowls.
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 March 2023: CIO registration
- 28 November 2023: Funds received from 204012 THE BRAMSHAW TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN RIDDOCH | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sharon Taylor | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Clare Victoria Canning | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Rose | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Patricia Lippiatt | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BARCIA | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Twigg | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF BRAMSHAW VILLAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFESTYLE OF THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Bramshaw
LYNDHURST
SO43 7JE
- Phone:
- 02381943927
- Email:
- bookingbramshaw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window