DAVID ROGERS ESTATE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The David Rogers Charity gives grants to local Charites & groups based on Mersea Island, Essex and the surrounding area. The aim of these grants are to assist other charitable organisations & groups to fulfil the work they undertake, thus easing the burden of funding on them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 08 September 2023: Standard registration
- DAVID ROGERS ESTATE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Michael Jackson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 May 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING POOR MENTAL HEALTH AND/OR FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS BY MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES ENGAGED IN: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN SUBSIDIZED SAILING EXPERIENCES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES IN AMATEUR SPORT WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Digby House
4 Barfield Road
West Mersea
COLCHESTER
CO5 8QT
- Phone:
- 07479 698545
- Email:
- dmrcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window