ELSIE'S ROSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship amongst parents of children (up to the age of 16) who are receiving end of life care and following their death in such ways as the trustees from time-to-time think fit, in particular, but not exclusively by the provision of grants and other forms of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annie Gould | Chair | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Martin | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Gould | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Brewis | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PARENTS OF CHILDREN (UP TO THE AGE OF 16) WHO ARE RECEIVING END OF LIFE CARE AND FOLLOWING THEIR DEATH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 LOWER ASHLEY ROAD
NEW MILTON
BH25 5QG
- Phone:
- 07766384609
- Email:
- elsiesrose@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window