BRITISH KASHMIRI MEDICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build a network of UK Kashmiri healthcare professionals to promote and share good clinical practice in the UK and abroad, with a particular focus in Kashmir.To develop and support initiatives to improve standards of health care in Kashmir.To promote links with healthcare professionals and institutions in Kashmir for the benefit of patients in Kashmir.To raise funds to support health in Kashmir
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 14 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Tafazul Hussain | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Burhan-Ul-Islam Malik | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shaheen Shora | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yasmin Naqushbandi | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Nazir Bhat | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eram Durrani | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sadaf Butt | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Nazir Ahmad Kuchhai | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ghulam Rasool Mufti | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Hussain Bhat | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN KASHMIR BY: 3.1.1.1 THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SUPPLIES; 3.1.1.2 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF DOCTORS, NURSES AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, TRAINING, ADVICE AND OTHER SUPPORT WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING HEALTH CARE FACILITIES; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, INCLUDING KASHMIR, WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, DISEASE, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HEATHER HILL
CHILWORTH ROAD
CHILWORTH
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 7JZ
- Phone:
- 07470452995
- Email:
- thebkma@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window