MENSTRUAL HEALTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Menstrual Health Project is here as just that, a project to provide practical support for those suffering with menstrual concerns and conditions to be able to navigate more accurately and comfortably through whatever stage in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate George | Chair | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebeccah Tomlinson | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Griffiths | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Sharma | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Donaldson | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amer Raza | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Hostettler-Davies | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MENSTRUAL HEALTH CONCERNS AND CONDITIONS FOR THOSE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED BY SCHOOLS, SCHOOL NURSES AND SEXUAL HEALTH CLINICS IN NEED OF SUPPORT THROUGH: • THE CREATION AND PROVISION OF ACCURATE AND MEDICALLY INFORMED TOOLKITS OF INFORMATION; • THE PROVISION OF AN ONLINE FACILITY FOR TOOLKITS OF INFORMATION; AND • WORKING TOGETHER WITH MEMBERS OF GOVERNMENT TO RAISE AWARENESS TO THE GENDER HEALTH GAP AND HOW WE CAN IMPROVE THIS. 3.2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF THEIR SUFFERING WITH MENSTRUAL HEALTH CONCERNS OR CONDITIONS THROUGH: • PEER-TO-PEER SUPPORT, VIA TELEPHONE, ONLINE, VIDEO CALLS OR IN PERSON, FROM THOSE WITH LIVED EXPERIENCE OF MENSTRUAL HEALTH RELATED ISSUES; • THE PROVISION OF AN ONLINE FACILITY TO ACCESS SUPPORT AND INFORMATIVE GUIDES; • THE PROVISION OF INFORMATIVE GUIDES FOR INDIVIDUALS UNDERGOING HOSPITAL BASED SURGERIES FOR CONDITIONS RELATED TO MENSTRUAL HEALTH; AND • THE PROVISION OF MENSTRUAL CARE PRODUCTS TO EASE MENSTRUAL SYMPTOMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ivy Cottage
Coach Road
Acrefair
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL14 3TN
- Phone:
- 07771356721
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window