HEART-BEATS DN22

Charity number: 1201594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Working in and around Retford, we - provide defibrillators for use by the public - train people to use defibrillators and CPR to save lives - educate people about heart health.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,035
Total expenditure: £6,780

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Estelle Speirs Chair 17 January 2023
None on record
Andrew Turner Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Neil Saxby Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record
Nicola Aisthorpe Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record
Lesley Dunlop Trustee 17 January 2023
WONDER YEARS CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE
Received: On time
7TH HEAVEN HEDGEHOG RESCUE
Received: On time
Andrew Fuller Trustee 17 January 2023
POST-ED NAVIGATION
Recently registered
Susan Pierce Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.04k
Total expenditure £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 BIRCHCROFT ROAD
RETFORD
DN22 7ZD
Phone:
07967798218
Website:

No information available