OLD KILN LIGHT RAILWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Old Kiln Light Railway (OKLR) aims to maintain the industrial, cultural and military heritage of how local railways brought about transformation during the late 19th and early 20th centuries. This includes how steam power enabled new ways of transporting goods and people faster and over longer distances than was previously possible by horsepower and barges, leading to the growth of towns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Field | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Holt | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Cooksley | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Poyner | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Harriss | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND SIGNIFICANCE OF INDUSTRIAL, RURAL PASSENGER AND MILITARY LIGHT NARROW-GAUGE RAILWAYS INCLUDING BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PRESERVING, RESTORING, EXHIBITING, AND OPERATING INDUSTRIAL, RURAL PASSENGER AND MILITARY NARROW-GAUGE RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES AND ROLLING STOCK AND BY MAKING ACCESSIBLE OTHER SIMILAR ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Kiln Light Railway
near to Rural Life Living Museum
Tilford
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU10 2DL
- Phone:
- 0
- Email:
- trustees@oklr.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window