FRIENDS OF PARKGATE INFANTS & NURSERY

Charity Number: 1201774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our aim is to enrich children's school experience, build community, and raise funds to improve resources. We support pupils through fundraising by parents, carers, friends, and teachers, providing items not covered by the school budget. Formal meetings are held at school. We organise events, both in-person and virtually, at school or other venues, ensuring safety and risk assessments are conducted

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 December 2023

Total income: £4,205
Total expenditure: £1,821

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elliott Dalrymple Chair 05 February 2024
None on record
Rigel Humbert Ordonez Trustee 05 February 2024
None on record
Sarah Henry Dalrymple Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
Khadija Pieterson Mrs Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/12/2023
Total gross income £4.21k
Total expenditure £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARKGATE INFANT SCHOOL
NORTHFIELD GARDENS
WATFORD
WD24 7RL
Phone:
01923221984
Website:

No information available