THE NORTH WEST POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2024: Standard registration
- THE BEN FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Gerard Kerrigan | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Zegham Awan | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||
David Stephen Howard | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Campbell Taylor | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SASHA HATCHETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Robertshaw | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mark Charles Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mark Unsworth | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
James Douglas McTear | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA LOUISE OLDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE BY PROTECTING AND PROMOTING THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND RELIEVING THE SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR INJURY OF ANY DESCRIPTION OF MEMBERS (AND AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION FORMER MEMBERS WHERE THIS FURTHERS THE PURPOSE) OF THE CONSTITUENT ORGANISATIONS BY THE PROVISION OF: A. TREATMENT, INCLUDING PHYSIOTHERAPY, STRESS REDUCTION AND EXERCISE CLASSES, HOLISTIC TREATMENTS, TALKING THERAPIES, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; B. FACILITIES, INCLUDING RESIDENTIAL RESPITE AND REHABILITATION FACILITIES, CONVALESCENCE OPPORTUNITIES, AND FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO AID STRESS REDUCTION AND IMPROVE MENTAL HEALTH. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF MEMBERS OR RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE CONSTITUENT ORGANISATIONS OR THEIR FAMILY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL GRANTS. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THE FAMILIES OF SERVING MEMBERS OF THE CONSTITUENT ORGANISATION ARISING FROM THE MEMBER’S DEATH IN SERVICE, BY MAKING GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Lodge
Northcote Road
Langho
BLACKBURN
BB6 8BG
- Phone:
- 01254244980
- Email:
- enquiries@nwpbf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.