BUCKS GIRLS RUGBY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote and grow girls Rugby throughout Buckinghamshire and surrounding counties. We will look to use Rugby to help girls become healthier and happier. We want to keep teenage girls involved in sport and regular fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Tebbutt | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Bond | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lock | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hammond | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/09/2023 | 19/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.90k | £14.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £10.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 September 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 September 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PARTICIPATION IN RECREATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF RUGBY SPECIFICALLY FOR GIRLS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 PUDDLE END
BROUGHTON
AYLESBURY
HP22 7BP
- Phone:
- 07766318309
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window