CONNECT 2 COMBAT HOMELESSNESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide high quality community support to all Vulnerable Homeless persons, as and when they need it. Our ultimate mission is to help them achieve independence and fulfilment by transforming their lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £8,283 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 April 2023: CIO registration
- VETERANS CONNECT CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR THOMAS BAILEY | Chair | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Painter | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Moffat | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Coombs | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric Matthew Teague Hellon | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Connect 2 Combat Homelessness
St. Georges Chambers
23 Merrial Street
NEWCASTLE
Staffordshire
ST5 2AE
- Phone:
- 01782363553
- Email:
- info@veteransconnect.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window