NEW VENTURES WORLDWIDE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Caroline Fawcett | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
I-Lin Hsieh | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Allan Gregory | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE, PREDOMINANTLY YOUNG PEOPLE, FROM BOTH THE UK AND OTHER COUNTRIES, BY ORGANISING, ADMINISTERING, AND SUPPLYING INFORMATION ABOUT VOLUNTARY SERVICE WORK AND OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES IN THE UK AND ABROAD, AIMED AT PROMOTING, IMPROVING AND ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND THEIR PERSONAL AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT, AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LIND STREET
RYDE
PO33 2NQ
- Phone:
- 07769055401
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window