DE-REBIRTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DE-Rebirth creative arts group is formed by a group of Music and sound students from the university of Salford Manchester. The main goal of the group is to make music on all genres (Non-explicit) including other arts, it is all about discovering, supporting, nurturing showcasing, performing, educating, celebrating and promoting talent in young people through collaborative music events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Bradford City
- City Of London
- City Of Wakefield
- Kent
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Wigan
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
Governance
- 31 October 2022: CIO registration
- DE-REBIRTH COLLECTIVE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Racheal Idris | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Joseph | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adesua Ebosele | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Airiohuodion | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/05/2023 | 18/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £662 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £648 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 May 2024 | 08 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 May 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL MUSIC TUITION (MAKINGMUSIC, READING, WRITING & LISTENING) AND PERFORMANCE CLASSES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 vine street
Apartment 3
MANCHESTER
Salford
M7 3PG
- Phone:
- 07533533543
- Email:
- derebirth2017@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window