Governing document HEIGHINGTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 520818

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1964 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 1965, 4 OCTOBER 1976, 15 MARCH 1989, 12 MARCH 1991 AND 11 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HEIGHINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.