Accounts and annual returns HETTON RECREATION GROUND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 520820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 29 January 2025 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 29 January 2025 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required