Financial history JARROW COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 520832
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £160.35k £27.08k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £198.09k £33.91k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A