JARROW COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jarrow Community Association provides facilities for educational, cultural, social and recreational activities for the benefit of the residents of Jarrow and the wider area of South Tyneside. We provide a wide ranging programme of activities that include: Performing arts, dance, health/well being and fitness, sport, information events and craft work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
- 19 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- JARROW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.35k | £27.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.09k | £33.91k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 April 2022 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 April 2022 | 434 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 April 2022 | 800 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 15TH NOVEMBER, 1950 AS AMENDED ON 06 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
SOUTH TYNESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window