HANSOT MAZHAR E SAA'DAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Projects for needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 26 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBADURREHMAN ABDURREHMAN PATEL | Chair | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asrafali Ibrahimbhai Isat | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
AYUB IBRAHIM KHALIFA | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 May 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF NECESSITIES SUCH AS FOOD, CLOTHING AND CLEAN WATER, AND COSTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167 Norman Avenue
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV11 5NZ
- Phone:
- 07570318581
- Email:
- Ibadpatel39@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window