THE G M ATHERTON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1201354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) for the benefit of the public by making grants, as the trustees see fit from time to time.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £167,478
Total expenditure: £2,844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guendolene Mary Atherton Chair 13 December 2022
None on record
CHRISTINE WENDY WALSH Trustee 13 December 2022
None on record
JAMES PATRICK ATHERTON Trustee 13 December 2022
THE SIR JAMES RECKITT CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £167.48k
Total expenditure £2.84k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The G M Atherton Foundation
Digges Place
Out Elmstead Lane
Barham
CANTERBURY
CT4 6PJ
Phone:
01635202126
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available