THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity Number: 1205529
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Booth Centre CIO is proud to work with UK citizens, refugees, migrants and anyone in need of support to address the impacts of homelessness, poverty and the immigration system. We have a wealth of experience and knowledge of person centred, trauma informed working for 30 years. We recognise the individual's right to identify how they choose, without risk and with respect. We are a community.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Lawler Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Justin Mottershead Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Alison Last Trustee 01 September 2023
THE BOOTH CENTRE
Received: On time
Patricia Gestoso Trustee 01 September 2023
THE BOOTH CENTRE
Received: On time
Ann Kendall Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Sajda Akbar Trustee 10 September 2022
THE BOOTH CENTRE
Received: On time
Megan Hadfield Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Sarah Nurton Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
David Briggs Trustee 18 February 2020
THE BOOTH CENTRE
Received: On time
WILMSLOW HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Josh McGarey Trustee 13 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Edward Holt House
Pimblett Street
Manchester
M3 1FU
Phone:
01618352499