FOUNDRY STREET COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundry Street Community Centre provides a secure, sustainable, accessible and culturally diverse space at the heart of Sowerby Bridge, to facilitate a wide range of inclusive activities which are valued and supported by the people of the area and which enhance their quality of life. This includes sporting, leisure, social, recreational and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £6,040 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 03 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Eastwood | Chair | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Grogan | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|||||
George Richard Pickles | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Sutcliffe | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Broadbent BA | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK RICHARD BAXENDALE | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF SOWERBY BRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foundry Street Community Centre
Foundry Street
SOWERBY BRIDGE
West Yorkshire
HX6 3AS
- Phone:
- 01422 380200
- Email:
- foundrystreetcc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window