ROYAL WELCH FUSILIERS REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Royal Welch Fusiliers Museum Trust Ltd maintains a leading international Regimental Museum which portrays the story of over 300 years of service by members of the Royal Welch Fusiliers by displaying a wide range of objects in an informative and attractive manner to the widest possible audience. The display collection is houses in Caernarfon Castle and the reserve collection in Wrexham Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
- Wrexham
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brig Gerhard Horst Wheeler | Chair | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN EMRYS DESMOND WILLIAMS DCM | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL PETER JAMES KNOX OBE | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh E S Beaumont | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Nicholas John Lock OBE MA | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allan David Poole | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pedley | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE FORMER BRITISH ARMY REGIMENT KNOWN AS THE ROYAL WELCH FUSILIERS (THE "REGIMENT"), IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY (A) ACQUIRING, HOUSING, EXHIBITING, DOCUMENTING, CONSERVING, RESTORING, AND REPAIRING ART, OBJECTS, AND COLLECTIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE, AND (B) BY ESTABLISHING, ACQUIRING, MANAGING, AND MAINTAINING MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, LIBRARIES, AND OTHER SUITABLE PREMISES FOR USE FOR SUCH PURPOSE; AND 2. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS OF THE COLLECTION OR BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAERNARFON CASTLE
CAERNARFON
Gwynedd
North Wales
LL55 2AY
- Phone:
- 01286673362
- Email:
- contact@rwfmuseum.wales
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window