FRESH WATERS CHRISTIAN CHARITY SHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty or financial hardship by the re-use, recycling and supplying of items of furniture and other household items to individuals in need in Keighley in the City of Bradford Borough of West Yorkshire. Also the relief of poverty in Keighley, Bradford district or any part of the United Kingdom or elsewhere in the world as the trustees determine appropriate to relieve poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Uganda
Governance
- 06 April 2023: CIO registration
- FRESHWATERS CHRISTIAN CHARITY SHOP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Ferrey | Chair | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Field | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Bailey | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
GLENIS KOUNNAS | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RE-USE, RECYCLING AND SUPPLYING OF ITEMS OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED IN KEIGHLEY IN THE CITY OF BRADFORD BOROUGH OF WEST YORKSHIRE; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KEIGHLEY, BRADFORD DISTRICT OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR FUNDING TO RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRESH WATERS CHRISTIAN CHARITY SHOP
21-23 BRIDGE STREET
KEIGHLEY
BD21 1AA
- Phone:
- 07528183815
- Email:
- freshwatersccs@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window