THE BEACON CHURCH, HINCKLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the mission, values and tenets of faith of the Church of England; and the prevention and relief of poverty primarily in, but not limited to, the Parish by, but not limited to, providing grants, items and services to individuals in need, to charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 February 2023: CIO registration
- THE BEACON CHURCH, HINKLEY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KIMBERLEY KAYE FORD | Chair | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Mary Jane Hills | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Oliver Yate Johnson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ennis Render | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION, VALUES AND TENETS OF FAITH OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND THROUGH: A. THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; B. OFFERING COMMUNITY OUTREACH, PASTORAL CARE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED; AND C. HOSTING EVENTS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING AN AFTER-SCHOOL CLUB AND LUNCH SERVICE, SO THAT THEY MAY MEET AND ENGAGE WITH THE CHURCH AND THOSE LEADING IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS COMMUNITY CENTRE
TUDOR ROAD
HINCKLEY
LE10 0EQ
- Phone:
- 07375868085
- Email:
- HELLO@THEBEACONHINCKLEY.ORG
- Website:
-
WWW.THEBEACONHINCKLEY.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window