THE STEAM TUG CERVIA PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is: To preserve, conserve and maintain for the public benefit the historic Steam Tug Cervia (National Heritage Ship number 5) as a heritage asset for the benefit and advancement of public education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 24 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Eric Walton | Chair | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Andon | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roger Simon Field | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM MICHAEL CHAMBERS | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CONOR NEIL PHILLIPS | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £865 | £4.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £571 | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 JAN 2023 AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE, CONSERVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE HISTORIC STEAM TUG CERVIA (NATIONAL HERITAGE SHIP NUMBER 5) AS A HERITAGE ASSET FOR THE BENEFIT AND ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY: OPENING HER TO PUBLIC DISPLAY, EITHER AS A WORKING VESSEL IF SHE CAN BE MADE SEAWORTHY, OR OTHERWISE AS A STATIC DISPLAY IN HER PRESENT LOCATION AT RAMSGATE HARBOUR OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT. IN EITHER CASE FOR HER TO SERVE ALSO AS A MEMORIAL TO MARINERS IN THE SHIP TOWAGE INDUSTRY WHO HAVE GIVEN THEIR LIVES IN THE COURSE OF THEIR DUTY AND TO THOSE WHO DIED ABOARD HER WHEN SHE SANK OFF TILBURY LOCK IN 1954. OPENING CERVIA TO THE PUBLIC AT AGREED TIMES IN ORDER TO EDUCATE ON THE IMPORTANCE OF SHIP TOWAGE, ENGINEERING AND STEAM TECHNOLOGY IN THIS CONTEXT. PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTEERS AND STUDENTS TO LEARN AND PRACTISE ENGINEERING AND OTHER PRACTICAL SKILLS AND TO ASSIST IN CERVIA’S ONGOING PRESERVATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Marlowe Innovation Centre
Marlowe Way
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT12 6FA
- Phone:
- 07550083079
- Email:
- info@steamtugcervia.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window