PELTON FELL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
over seeing public park and its up keep
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 08 August 1967: Standard registration
- PELTON FELL WAR MEMORIAL PARK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEANETTE REED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS STOREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN GARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £591 | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.47k | £10.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JUNE 19669 NOTE:- A SCHEME IS TO BE MADE.
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
PELTON FELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 BRACKENBEDS CLOSE
PELTON
CHESTER LE STREET
DH2 1XL
- Phone:
- 0193702958
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window