RND FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Director of RnD identified how young people of colour are underrepresented in the dance and music industry. The company works with community members in London. It has formed the charity RND Foundation to provide free dance and music lessons to those from disadvantaged backgrounds to improve access and representation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROYSTON GOODEN | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaileen Rameshchandra Shah | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JERMAIN JACKMAN | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN NNOCHIRI | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECT IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED ETHNIC MINORITY YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 12 TO 24:- TO ADVANCE YOUNG PEOPLE IN LIFE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, ABILITY AND CAPACITY TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, INCLUDING; PROVIDING GRANTS TO YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 16 AND ABOVE IN HIGHER EDUCATION AND/OR FURTHER TRAINING IN DANCE AND/OR SINGING; PROVIDING ACCESS TO MONTHLY WORKSHOPS TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN DANCE AND SINGING TO LIFT BARRIERS TO ARTISTIC DEVELOPMENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Siyah Garden
LONDON
E3 4TR
- Phone:
- 07958537810
- Email:
- foundation@rndcreatives.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window