ST GREGORY'S CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company is a charity and exists to promote the Christian Faith and alleviate suffering according to the mission of the Church of England and the values and tenets of the Anglican Communion summarised in resolution 11 of the third Lambeth conference following the Chicago-Lambeth quadrilateral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 November 2022: CIO registration
- ST GREGORY'S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard James Spens | Chair | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Struan Hodson | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anna Hyde | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Alexander James Soper | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Eric Horne | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Oluwadamilola Makinde | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR WITHIN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE DIOCESE OF TRURO IN PARTICULAR BY, (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ESTABLISHING A NEW WORSHIPPING COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 STRET MYGHTERN ARTHUR
NANSLEDAN
NEWQUAY
TR8 4GJ
- Phone:
- 07793277012
- Email:
- anna@stgregorys.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window