JUST ICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We create bespoke employment, encouragement & support for individuals who have suffered the trauma of modern day slavery. We do that by making fabulous artisan ice cream in Derbyshire. Our small team are trauma informed & journey with each individual to empower & equip them for their future. We raise awareness & speak on spotting the signs of slavery in schools, businesses & our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 02 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheralyn Pattison | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Deardra Denny | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Arnold Edwin Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Savage | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Simpson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Mark Wigglesworth | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Murray | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Murray | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £792 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN WHO ARE SURVIVORS OF MODERN SLAVERY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND OTHER SUPPORT WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THEM BECOME INDEPENDENT AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THE SUBJECT OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY IN PARTICULAR THE CONSEQUENCES FOR, AND NEEDS OF, SURVIVORS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bakehouse
Abbey Yard
Darley Abbey
Derby
DE22 1DS
- Phone:
- 01332 552888
- Email:
- sally@just-ice.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window