Financial history QUEBEC AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.22k £25.96k £17.06k £22.03k £21.07k
Total expenditure £18.56k £11.15k £23.11k £20.44k £23.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £23.75k £4.05k £14.90k £8.80k