QUEBEC AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall used by the residents of the village & the surrounding district. Activities in the hall are:- meetings, exercise classes, demonstrations, craft fairs & functions both private and for the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £8,800 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 10 February 1964: Standard registration
- QUEBEC AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ALLISON FLANNIGAN | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
suzette Scharschmidt | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Seed | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.22k | £25.96k | £17.06k | £22.03k | £21.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £11.15k | £23.11k | £20.44k | £23.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £23.75k | £4.05k | £14.90k | £8.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12 SEP 1952
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST TO BE USED FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL WELL BEING OF THE INHABITANTS OF QUEBEC AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND ALSO FOR SUCH EDUCATIONAL CULTURAL SOCIAL AND OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
QUEBEC AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quebec & District Village Hall
Front street
Quebec
DURHAM
DH7 9DF
- Phone:
- 07711940384
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window