THE DIANA STARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Diana Startin Charitable Trust is a charity that supports the helping of the old, the sick, the disabled, and the disadvantaged. It also supports the relief of patients suffering from Cancer, Parkinson's Disease and Strokes. The charity aims to support local charities within Warwickshire and surrounding areas by donating funds which were given by the founder.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROGER GADSBY | Trustee | 17 December 2008 |
|
|||||
David Stuart Degge Lodder | Trustee | 17 December 2008 |
|
|||||
Diana Rosemary Wilson Startin | Trustee | 17 December 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
B. OBJECTSTHE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME OF IT UPON TRUST FIRST TO PAY FROM IT ALL PROPER COSTS AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ADMINISTERING THE CHARITY AND THE TRUST FUND AND SUBJECT TO THAT TO PAY OR APPLY AND (IF AND WHEN AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH HAVE AS THEIR MAIN OBJECTS ANY OF THE FOLLOWING:- (1) THE HELPING OF THE OLD THE SICK THE DISABLED AND THE DISADVANTAGED (2)THE RELIEVE OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, PARKINSON'S DISEASE AND STROKES INCLUDING MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO SUCH DISEASE (3) THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT (4) THE PROVISION OF A BURIAL GROUND FOR ST GILES CHURCH, EXHALL (5) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LODDERS SOLICITORS LLP
10 ELM COURT
ARDEN STREET
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 6PA
- Phone:
- 01789206101
- Email:
- david.lodder@lodders.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window