PARENTS OF THINGWALL PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhance the education of pupils at Thingwall Primary School by engaging in activities which support the school and advance education, learning and personal development of the pupils and wider school family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
Total income includes £4,995 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 November 2022: Standard registration
- POTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Barnish | Chair | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Carole Louise Edwards | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Eastaff | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Sutcliffe | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Thingwall Primary School
559 Pensby Road
Thingwall
CH61 9UG
- Phone:
- 01516484885
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window