FRIENDS OF BOLEHILL WOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Woodland protection
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 July 2023: CIO registration
- FOBW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Dembo | Chair | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Eastburn | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marsden-Lambert | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Robin Scott | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Jordan | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Zelaieta | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robinson | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Falconer | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT OF BOLEHILL WOOD, SHEFFIELD S8, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (A) PROMOTING GOOD WOODLAND MANAGEMENT (B) OPPOSING ANY DETRIMENTAL USE (C) RAISING FUNDS TO BUY ANY AVAILABLE PART OF BOLEHILL WOOD TO MANAGE IT ON BEHALF OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY (D) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY REGARDING LOCAL CONSERVATION AND WILDLIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15A COBNAR AVENUE
SHEFFIELD
S8 8RL
- Phone:
- 01142580901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window