FULHAM CAMERATA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a chamber choir based in south-west London which rehearses regularly and gives public concerts. Our objects are to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects. For further details please visit our website www.fulhamcamerata.com.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 29 November 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Nugee | Chair | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Perkins | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Henry Beach | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Cooper | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rachel Keat | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Burgoine | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jill Wordley | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Grandbesancon | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judit Katalin Schoblocher | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.73k | £23.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.52k | £19.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ASHINGTON ROAD
LONDON
SW6 3QJ
- Phone:
- 02077311416
- Email:
- INFO@FULHAMCAMERATA.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window