AHAVA EXPERIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities at Ahava Experience take place online via Zoom, with access to a physical location for in-person events. In addition to these services, we hold religious fellowship group meetings for men and women, as well as Bible study classes, to promote our religious beliefs. We also hold religious meetings, conferences, and concerts throughout the year to promote and share our Christian faith.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Ireland
- Italy
- Nigeria
Governance
- 24 February 2023: CIO registration
- ACE AHAVA CITY EXPERIENCE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Lamptey | Chair | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miracle Andoh | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, BIBLE STUDY CLASSES, EVANGELISING CONFERENCES AND EVENTS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PASTORAL CARE AND COMMUNITY OUTREACH. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
M'nuchah
392 Camden Road
LONDON
N7 0sj
- Phone:
- 07534427650
- Email:
- info@ahavaexperience.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window